NH HB452 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the governor's authority to declare a state of emergency.
Title
Repealing the governor's authority to declare a state of emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Brian Seaworth [R] | Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] |
Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Joseph Hannon [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 797 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 8-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 405 |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 8:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |