NH HB450 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study and make recommendations for a common definition of employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study and make recommendations for a common definition of employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-28 - Senate - Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment 1943s (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18SenateConference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 19
2015-06-10HouseConference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2015-06-04SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Prescott, Pierce, and Soucy
2015-06-04SenateSen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17
2015-06-03HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Infantine, K. Murphy, L. Turcotte, and C. Rice; House Journal 44, PG. 1815
2015-06-03HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1943s and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Infantine): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1815
2015-05-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1943s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateSen. Soucy Floor Amendment #2015-1990s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateSen. Bradley moved Floor Amendment #2015-1943s, New Title, Regular Calendar 11Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateSen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2015-1943s, New Title, Div. 9Y-9N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 16
2015-05-28SenateCommittee Amendment 1836s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote
2015-05-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1836s, New Title, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23
2015-04-08SenateHearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17
2015-03-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0335h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1238-1242
2015-03-12HouseAmendment #0335h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1238-1242
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0335h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 431
2015-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 2/3/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG. 224

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback