NH HB449 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the repair of home appliances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the repair of home appliances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-03-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 65
2021-03-03House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary)
2021-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452
2021-02-17HousePublic Hearing: 02/17/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99607943571 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 48

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback