NH HB448 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/17/2021; Chapter 216; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/17/2021; Chapter 216; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study and compare federal Occupational Safety and Health Act standards with the safety and health standards the New Hampshire department of labor uses for public sector employees.
Title
Establishing a committee to study and compare federal Occupational Safety and Health Act standards with the safety and health standards the New Hampshire department of labor uses for public sector employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/17/2021; Chapter 216; Eff: 08/17/2021 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1298s (Rep. Infantine): Motion Adopted DV 355-4 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1298s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1298s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1298s, 05/13/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/27/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-09 | House | Reconsider (Rep. T. Smith): Motion Failed DV 143-230 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 22 |
2021-04-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 201-166 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 22 |
2021-02-25 | House | Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 32 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/11/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96195399441 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 48 |