NH HB448 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 244; Eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 244; Eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain ignition interlock violations.
Title
Relative to certain ignition interlock violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 244; Eff. 7/18/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2190c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 22 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2190c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2190c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/08/2017 01:10 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Lasky; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sapareto, Welch, Fields, O'Leary 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1404s and Requests CofC (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1404s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1404s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1404s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 13 |