NH HB448 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-103; House Journal 24, PG. 891-892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-103; House Journal 24, PG. 891-892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing February 6 as Ronald Reagan Day.
Title
Establishing February 6 as Ronald Reagan Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 196 N: 103 NV: 98 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-103; House Journal 24, PG. 891-892 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 9-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 425 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-02-05 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 ==RECESSED== |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 224 |