NH HB446 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-05 - House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Division Vote 214-116; House Journal 8, PG.501
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-05 - House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Division Vote 214-116; House Journal 8, PG.501
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the authority for regulation of certain professional occupations.
Title
Repealing the authority for regulation of certain professional occupations.
Sponsors
Rep. Spec Bowers [R] | Rep. Seth Cohn [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. George Lambert [R] |
Rep. Calvin Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-05 - House - OTP/AM 2639H (Y: 135 N: 195 NV: 36 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2012-01-05 - House - LAID ON TABLE (REP GANDIA) (Y: 62 N: 269 NV: 34 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2012-01-05 - House - LAID ON TABLE (REP GANDIA) (Y: 62 N: 269 NV: 34 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Division Vote 214-116; House Journal 8, PG.501 | |
2012-01-05 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2639h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 135-195; House Journal 8, PG.499-501 | |
2012-01-05 | House Laid on Table (Rep Gandia): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 62-269; House Journal 8, PG.497-499 | |
2012-01-05 | House Floor Amendment #2012-0095h (Rep Chandler) Failed, Voice Vote; House Journal 8, PG.497 | |
2012-01-05 | House Floor Amendment #2012-0116h(NT) (Rep Millham) Failed, Division Vote 112-219; House Journal 8, PG.496-497 | |
2012-01-05 | House Amendment #2639h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 8, PG.491-496 | |
2011-11-02 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 70, PG.2218 | |
2011-11-02 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-2639h; House Calendar 69, PG.2135-2140 | |
2011-11-02 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2639h for Jan 4 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2218 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 (If Necessary Continued 11/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306) | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-08-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/23/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-08-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/16/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-07-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/9/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-07-27 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/2/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-06-22 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/28/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-02 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 2:00 PM or 45 mins after House session Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/24/2011 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 2:00 PM Representative's Hall | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Executive Departments & Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 186 |