NH HB443 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing that marriage between one man and one woman shall be the only legal domestic union that shall be valid or recognized in this state.
Title
Establishing that marriage between one man and one woman shall be the only legal domestic union that shall be valid or recognized in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
Rep. Leo Pepino [R] | Rep. Kathleen Souza [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-09-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/14/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-03 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 10:30 Amendment Representative's Hall | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 186 |