NH HB442 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 233-126 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to coyote hunting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to coyote hunting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 233-126 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 8
2019-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 27
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback