NH HB440 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing: 03/29/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 29 @ 9:40 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the uses of education trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the uses of education trust fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - House - OTP (Y: 191 N: 185 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateHearing: 03/29/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 15
2023-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 10
2023-03-09HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-185 03/09/2023 House Journal 8
2023-03-09HouseReconsider HB440 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 181-195 03/09/2023 House Journal 8
2023-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 02/06/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13
2023-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2023 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-01-11HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback