NH HB440 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB440

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the suspension of civil liberties during a state of emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the suspension of civil liberties during a state of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 178 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A
2021-05-06SenateRemote Hearing: 05/11/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0486h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-178 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 2
2021-04-09HouseAmendment # 2021-0486h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 2
2021-03-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0486h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 53
2021-03-10HouseExecutive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682
2021-03-02House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688
2021-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91679735236 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-10HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 48

Same As/Similar To

HB440 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback