NH HB440 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the tax on interest and dividends.
Title
Repealing the tax on interest and dividends.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Christensen [R] | Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Bill Ohm [R] |
Rep. Richard Barry [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] | Rep. Norman Silber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16 |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 13 |