NH HB439 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Doucette): Motion Adopted DV 189-186 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Doucette): Motion Adopted DV 189-186 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the powers of city councils.
Title
Relative to the powers of city councils.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Blasek [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Juliet Harvey-Bolia [R] | Rep. Dawn Johnson [R] |
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] | Rep. Andrew Prout [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - OTP (Y: 185 N: 192 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Doucette): Motion Adopted DV 189-186 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 34 |
2021-04-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 185-192 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 32 |
2021-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 58 |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97119253057 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 48 |