NH HB437 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study parental alienation.
Title
Establishing a commission to study parental alienation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2019-1542s; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2019-1542s; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1542s, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1019h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-1019h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1019h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2019-03-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-02-26 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 14 |