NH HB437 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 139; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 139; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of municipal law enforcement officers and relative to information contained in certain motor vehicle records.
Title
Relative to the authority of municipal law enforcement officers and relative to information contained in certain motor vehicle records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 139; Eff. 6/16/2017 |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1621s (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1621s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1621s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1621s, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Hearing: 05/02/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am, on proposed amendment #2017-1430s; Senate Calendar 21 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 41 |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 13 |