NH HB437 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the road toll.
Title
Relative to the road toll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-08 | House | Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 10/23/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-08-21 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-02-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 12, PG.195 |