NH HB437 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Tregenza): Motion Failed Division Vote 136-161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-21 - House - ITL (REP SIMMONS) (Y: 211 N: 116 NV: 25 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - OTP (Y: 133 N: 202 NV: 19 Abs: 43) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - RECONSIDER COMM AM 2779H(NT) (REP CARTWRIGHT) (Y: 144 N: 193 NV: 17 Abs: 43) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - OBJECT TO CONSIDERATION OF MTN RE: FLAM 0478H (REP WINTER) (Y: 286 N: 52 NV: 19 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - LAY ON THE TABLE (REP HUNT) (Y: 82 N: 263 NV: 13 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - FLAM 1288H(NT) (REP BATES) (Y: 162 N: 188 NV: 10 Abs: 37) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - AM 2779H(NT) (Y: 82 N: 266 NV: 13 Abs: 36) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-29 House Print Debate in Permanent Journal (Rep Tregenza): Motion Failed Division Vote 136-161
2012-03-21 House Reconsider Motion of Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Jennifer Coffey): Motion Failed Division Vote 87-211; House Journal 28, PG.1711
2012-03-21 House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Simmons): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-116; House Journal 28, PG.1709-1711
2012-03-21 House Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 133-202; House Journal 28, PG.1707-1709
2012-03-21 House Reconsider Comm Amendment #2779(NT) (Rep Cartwright): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-193; House Journal 28, PG.1705-1707
2012-03-21 House Suspend Rule 35E to Hear FL Amendment #1097h(NT) (Rep Lambert): Motion Failed Division Vote 62-277; House Journal 28, PG.1705
2012-03-21 House Object to Consideration of Motion Regarding FL Amendment 0478h (Rep Winter): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 286-52; House Journal 28, PG.1702-1705
2012-03-21 House FL Amendment #2012-0478h (Rep Lambert); House Journal 28, PG.1702
2012-03-21 House Lay On The Table (Rep Hunt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 82-263; House Journal 28, PG.1700-1702
2012-03-21 House FL Amendment #2012-1097h(NT) (Rep Manuse); House Journal 28, PG.1700
2012-03-21 House FL Amendment #1288h(NT) (Rep Bates): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 162-188; House Journal 28, PG.1698-1700
2012-03-21 House Reconsider Division of Sec.6 from FL Amendment 1288h(NT) (Rep Manuse): Motion Failed Division Vote 128-222; House Journal 28, PG.1698
2012-03-21 House Divide Sec.6 from FL Amendment #1288h(NT) (Rep Mirski): Motion Failed Division Vote 173-179; House Journal 28, PG.1698
2012-03-21 House FL Amendment #2012-1288h(NT) (Rep Bates); House Journal 28, PG.1697-1698
2012-03-21 House Amendment #2779h(NT) Failed, Regular Calendar 82-266; House Journal 28, PG.1692-1697
2011-11-02 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2779h (New Title); House Calendar 22, PG.1372-1374
2011-11-02 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2779h(NT) for Mar 21 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.1356-1357
2011-09-14 House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-09-01 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/14/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-03-03 House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-02-23 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2011-02-09 House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 10:30 Amendment Representative's Hall
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 186

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=14&sy=2012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&q=1
Texthttp://www.gencourt.state.nh.us/legislation/2012/HB0437.html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=183&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=184&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=185&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=186&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=187&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=188&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=189&sy=2012&lb=H&eb=HB0437&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2012&ddlsponsors=&q=1&lsr=14

Bill Comments

feedback