NH HB436 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting persons using virtual currency from registering as money transmitters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting persons using virtual currency from registering as money transmitters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 185 N: 170 NV: 9 Abs: 31) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateSpecial Order HB 436 to after the C of C Report, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-30SenateHearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0441h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-170 03/08/2017
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0441h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017
2017-02-16HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-16HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0441h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback