NH HB436 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 779
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the penalty for making a false statement in a criminal complaint.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the penalty for making a false statement in a criminal complaint.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 779
2015-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 395
2015-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 223

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback