NH HB436 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the guardian ad litem board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the guardian ad litem board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-23 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.462
2011-02-16 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 23 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.271
2011-02-15 House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 208 Following House Session
2011-02-01 House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 186

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback