NH HB435 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1988s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain terminology in the rulemaking authority of the department of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain terminology in the rulemaking authority of the department of education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1988s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2019-1988s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1837s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1837s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-27HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 99
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 9
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 9
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 4
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback