NH HB435 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB435
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding of the national guard scholarship fund.
Title
Relative to funding of the national guard scholarship fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35 |
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-19 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-09-20 | House | Retained Bill Division I Work Session: 09/28/2017 10:35 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-23 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/02/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 47 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0148h: Motion Adopted DV 314-28 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 47 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2017-0148h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 47 |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0148h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 22 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB435 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar)