NH HB435 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding for chartered public school pupils.
Title
Relative to funding for chartered public school pupils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2013-11-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2013-09-03 | House | =RESCEDULED=Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-08-06 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/27/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-06-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/6/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-06-17 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-05-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/14/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-11 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/2/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-03-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/2/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/14/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.195 |