NH HB433 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for juvenile delinquency petitions filed by a school district or school official.
Title
Relative to procedures for juvenile delinquency petitions filed by a school district or school official.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | House | Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0198 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1968e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1648 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1968e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 4/30/13, Room 100, State House, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0566h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.738 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0566h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.738 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0566h (New Title); House Calendar 22, PG.549 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0566h(NT) for Mar 13 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.499 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-02-07 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/14/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG.195 |