NH HB431 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 138; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2018 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study long term goals and requirements for drinking water in the seacoast area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study long term goals and requirements for drinking water in the seacoast area.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 138; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/1/2018 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/16/2017
2017-06-01HouseEnrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19
2017-05-18HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1317s (Rep. Christensen): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7
2017-04-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1317s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1317s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1317s, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-28SenateHearing: 04/04/2017, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0320h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 44
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0320h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 44
2017-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0320h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-02-15House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-08House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-02-01House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-02-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback