NH HB430 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 258-77 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 258-77 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring school boards to establish conflict of interest policies.
Title
Requiring school boards to establish conflict of interest policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] |
Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Becky Owens [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 258-77 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62 |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Torosian) 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 7 |
2019-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 14 |