NH HB430 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to extending the veterans' property tax credit to all honorably discharged veterans.
Title
Relative to extending the veterans' property tax credit to all honorably discharged veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Rep. John Martin [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Brad Bailey [R] |
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Frank McCarthy [R] | Rep. Bill Kuch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-08-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 8:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 223 |