NH HB429 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Signed by the Governor on 5/5/2015; Chapter 14; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective Date 5/5/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Signed by the Governor on 5/5/2015; Chapter 14; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective Date 5/5/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reviving the commission to review and consider alcoholic beverage manufacturing processes and retail sales in manufacturing facilities.
Title
Reviving the commission to review and consider alcoholic beverage manufacturing processes and retail sales in manufacturing facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/5/2015; Chapter 14; Section 2 Effective Date 11/1/2016, Remaining Effective Date 5/5/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 4/15/2015); House Journal 34, PG. 1564 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/9/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 772 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 392-393 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 223 |