NH HB429 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to service of writs against cities.
Title
Relative to service of writs against cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0046 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.765 |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.509 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.195 |