NH HB429 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 19, Pg.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 19, Pg.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a child 16 years of age or older to withdraw from school with parental permission.
Title
Permitting a child 16 years of age or older to withdraw from school with parental permission.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] | Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] | Rep. Paul Mirski [R] | Rep. James Parison [R] |
Rep. Charles Sova [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - OUGHT TO PASS (REP PARISON) (Y: 210 N: 134 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - OUGHT TO PASS (REP PARISON) (Y: 210 N: 134 NV: 54 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 19, Pg.513 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-04-22 | Senate Hearing: 4/26/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass (Rep Parison): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-134; House Journal 26, PG.786-788 | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee Report: Without Recommendation for Mar 15 (Vote 8-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.550 | |
2011-02-18 | House Executive Session: 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205-207 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 186 |