NH HB427 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB427 on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Adopted DV 309-72 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB427 on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Adopted DV 309-72 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public comment and inquiry during school board meetings.
Title
Relative to public comment and inquiry during school board meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Vanessa Sheehan [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Lay HB427 on Table (Rep. Cordelli): Motion Adopted DV 309-72 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 61 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/07/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 19 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 15 |