NH HB420 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to naming buildings and other construction built using public funds.
Title
Relative to naming buildings and other construction built using public funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/11/2019; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0315h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 22 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0315h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 22 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0315h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 13 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 13 |