NH HB420 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 243; Eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 243; Eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ignition interlock requirements in manslaughter cases involving alcohol.
Title
Relative to ignition interlock requirements in manslaughter cases involving alcohol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 243; Eff. 7/18/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2381e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 26 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2381e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2191c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2191c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2191c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/08/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Lasky; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sapareto, Welch, Fields, O'Leary 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1405s and Requests CofC (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1405s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1405s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1405s, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 17 |
2017-02-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 9 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 11 |