NH HB419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 108; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 108; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the position of house clerk.
Title
Relative to the position of house clerk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 108; Eff: 08/20/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 69 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 12-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 13 |