NH HB418 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 1:30 am in pm Legislative Office Building 306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the limitations on part-time employment under the New Hampshire retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the limitations on part-time employment under the New Hampshire retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback