NH HB418 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 06/04/2013; Chapter 0044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 06/04/2013; Chapter 0044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study a program to address children in need.
Title
Establishing a committee to study a program to address children in need.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Walz [D] | Rep. Leigh Webb [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Gale [D] | Rep. Larry Phillips [D] | Rep. Stephen Spratt [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - OTP/AM 0152H (Y: 293 N: 50 NV: 17 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 06/04/2013; Chapter 0044 |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Hearing: 3/19/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0152h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 293-50; House Journal 17, PG.336-338 |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendment #0152h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.336-338 |
2013-02-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0152h; House Calendar 13, PG.234 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0152h for Feb 13 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.213 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG.195 |