NH HB418 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - House Signed by the Governor 03/12/2012; Effective 05/11/2012; Chapter 0005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of open source software and open data formats by state agencies and relative to the adoption of a statewide information policy regarding open government data standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of open source software and open data formats by state agencies and relative to the adoption of a statewide information policy regarding open government data standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-12 House Signed by the Governor 03/12/2012; Effective 05/11/2012; Chapter 0005
2012-02-15 House Enrolled; House Journal 16, PG.969
2012-02-08 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 5, Pg.123
2012-02-01 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep C.Mcguire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.739
2012-01-18 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0009s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.55
2012-01-18 Senate Committee Amendment 0009s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.55
2012-01-12 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0009s, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3
2011-09-01 Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 9/8/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 36
2011-05-04 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.304
2011-04-28 Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22
2011-04-14 Senate Hearing: 4/21/11, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20
2011-03-30 Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0733h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.801-803
2011-03-15 House Amendment #0733h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.801-803
2011-03-10 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0733h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.617-619
2011-03-10 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0733h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.554
2011-03-02 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2011-03-02 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2011 4:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2011-02-23 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/2/2011 2:00 PM or 45 mins after House session Legislative Office Building 306
2011-02-22 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/24/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2011-02-14 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/16/2011 Legislative Office Building 306 1:30 PM or 45 minutes following House session
2011-02-02 House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2011-01-21 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 185

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback