NH HB417 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study creating a New Hampshire plan for Alzheimer's disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study creating a New Hampshire plan for Alzheimer's disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.657
2013-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.412
2013-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 2/14/2013 Legislative Office Building 205 11:00 Amendment Or One Hour After Governor's Budget Address
2013-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.195

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback