NH HB414 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 353-10; House Journal 19, PG.423-425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 353-10; House Journal 19, PG.423-425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an assessment on motor vehicle inspections to be deposited in the police standards and training council training fund.
Title
Establishing an assessment on motor vehicle inspections to be deposited in the police standards and training council training fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - ITL (Y: 353 N: 10 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 353-10; House Journal 19, PG.423-425 | |
2011-02-15 | House Special Order to Feb 16: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 17, PG.378 | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 11-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.237 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 11, PG. 185 |