NH HB410 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2219s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing all state agencies and political subdivisions to have access to enhanced 911 information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing all state agencies and political subdivisions to have access to enhanced 911 information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2219s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2219s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2219s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2219s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0048h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 60
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0048h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 291-59 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 60
2019-01-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-01-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0048h (NT) for 02/14/2019 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16
2019-01-17HouseExecutive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback