NH HB409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Enrolled 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the maximum optional fee for transportation improvements charged by municipalities when collecting motor vehicle registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the maximum optional fee for transportation improvements charged by municipalities when collecting motor vehicle registration fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Sherman Moved Ought to Pass; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: No Recommendation, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/25/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 234-103 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62
2019-03-19HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback