NH HB407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the non taxability of certain telecommunications devices and equipment.
Title
Clarifying the non taxability of certain telecommunications devices and equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 05/15/2019 Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 19A |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 3 |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 3 |
2019-03-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-03-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 74 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 19 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 13 |