NH HB407 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 232; Effective Date 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 232; Effective Date 7/13/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the classifications of military vehicles and equipment that may be purchased by the state and its political subdivisions.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the classifications of military vehicles and equipment that may be purchased by the state and its political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 134 N: 204 NV: 60 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 232; Effective Date 7/13/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2351eba (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139-2140 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2351e Adopted, Voice Vote, New Title, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2236c: Adopted, DV 302-53; House Journal 54, PG. 2125 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2236c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2015-2236c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-06-09 | House | Conferee Change: Rep Tatro Replaces Rep Porter; House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Bradley, and Fuller Clark |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps J. Belanger, Sterling, Coffey, Porter; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1355s and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1355s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1355s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1355s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 407 from the Consent Calendar |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1355s, New Title, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1355s, New Title, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/24/15, Room 100, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-18 | House | Speaker Waived Second Committee Referral |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Executive Departments and Administration |
2015-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0472h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 538-541 |
2015-02-18 | House | Floor Amendment #2015-0472h (NT) (Rep Ammon): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 540-541 |
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 134-204; House Journal 20, PG. 538-540 |
2015-02-18 | House | Special Order to end of regular calendar (Rep Flanagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 521 |
2015-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 248-249 |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2015 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 1:40 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 221 |