NH HB406 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 29; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to reporting and investigation of serious injuries and death in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to reporting and investigation of serious injuries and death in the workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 29; Eff: 07/14/2019
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-18SenateSpecial Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-18SenateSpecial Order to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 9
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-02-12House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-02-05House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback