NH HB404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 289-48 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a local option for liquefied natural gas storage facility sitings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a local option for liquefied natural gas storage facility sitings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 289-48 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 33
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0582h (NT)
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 18
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback