NH HB403 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to domicile affidavits.
Title
Relative to domicile affidavits.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 10/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-10-05 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 11 |
Same As/Similar To
HB403 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)