NH HB4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 09/26/2019; Chapter 346; I. Sections 1/64/165/248 paragraph I of section 290/314/324 and 355-356 of this act shall take effect June 30 2019. II. Section 232-233 and 389 of this act shall take effect July 1 2019 at 12:01 a.m. III. Sections 97-109/ 131-138/ 203-205/ 213/ 252-257 and 365-367 / RSA 170-G:4-d as inserted by section 344 shall take effect January 1 2020. IV. Sections 92-94 of this act shall take effect January 1 2020 at 12:01 a.m. and section 96 of this act shall not take effect. V. Sections 234-235/ 250/ 259-265 and RSA 170-G:4-b as inserted by section 344 of this act shall take effect July 1 2020. VI. Section 5 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 6 of this act. VII. Section 393 of this act shall take effect July 12 2019 at 12:01 a.m. VIII. Sections 399-419 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 423 of this act. IX. Paragraph I of section 422 of this act shall take effect December 1 2024. X. Sections 184-190 of this act shall take effect September 26 2019. XI. Section 191 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 192 of this act. XII. Sections 360-362 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 363 of this act. XIII. Section 433 of this shall take effect December 1 2020. XIV. Sections 424 and 425 of this act shall take effect January 1 2021. XV. Sections 426-429 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 432 of this act. XVI. Section 236 of this act shall take effect July 1 2021. XVII. The remainder of this act shall take effect July 1 2019.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 09/26/2019; Chapter 346; I. Sections 1/64/165/248 paragraph I of section 290/314/324 and 355-356 of this act shall take effect June 30 2019. II. Section 232-233 and 389 of this act shall take effect July 1 2019 at 12:01 a.m. III. Sections 97-109/ 131-138/ 203-205/ 213/ 252-257 and 365-367 / RSA 170-G:4-d as inserted by section 344 shall take effect January 1 2020. IV. Sections 92-94 of this act shall take effect January 1 2020 at 12:01 a.m. and section 96 of this act shall not take effect. V. Sections 234-235/ 250/ 259-265 and RSA 170-G:4-b as inserted by section 344 of this act shall take effect July 1 2020. VI. Section 5 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 6 of this act. VII. Section 393 of this act shall take effect July 12 2019 at 12:01 a.m. VIII. Sections 399-419 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 423 of this act. IX. Paragraph I of section 422 of this act shall take effect December 1 2024. X. Sections 184-190 of this act shall take effect September 26 2019. XI. Section 191 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 192 of this act. XII. Sections 360-362 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 363 of this act. XIII. Section 433 of this shall take effect December 1 2020. XIV. Sections 424 and 425 of this act shall take effect January 1 2021. XV. Sections 426-429 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 432 of this act. XVI. Section 236 of this act shall take effect July 1 2021. XVII. The remainder of this act shall take effect July 1 2019.
Summary
Relative to state fees, funds, revenues and expenditures.
Title
Relative to state fees, funds, revenues and expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - OTP (Y: 316 N: 40 NV: 16 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - OTP (Y: 316 N: 40 NV: 16 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 09/26/2019; Chapter 346; I. Sections 1/64/165/248 paragraph I of section 290/314/324 and 355-356 of this act shall take effect June 30 2019. II. Section 232-233 and 389 of this act shall take effect July 1 2019 at 12:01 a.m. III. Sections 97-109/ 131-138/ 203-205/ 213/ 252-257 and 365-367 / RSA 170-G:4-d as inserted by section 344 shall take effect January 1 2020. IV. Sections 92-94 of this act shall take effect January 1 2020 at 12:01 a.m. and section 96 of this act shall not take effect. V. Sections 234-235/ 250/ 259-265 and RSA 170-G:4-b as inserted by section 344 of this act shall take effect July 1 2020. VI. Section 5 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 6 of this act. VII. Section 393 of this act shall take effect July 12 2019 at 12:01 a.m. VIII. Sections 399-419 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 423 of this act. IX. Paragraph I of section 422 of this act shall take effect December 1 2024. X. Sections 184-190 of this act shall take effect September 26 2019. XI. Section 191 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 192 of this act. XII. Sections 360-362 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 363 of this act. XIII. Section 433 of this shall take effect December 1 2020. XIV. Sections 424 and 425 of this act shall take effect January 1 2021. XV. Sections 426-429 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 432 of this act. XVI. Section 236 of this act shall take effect July 1 2021. XVII. The remainder of this act shall take effect July 1 2019. |
2019-09-25 | House | Enrolled 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 20 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 09/25/2019); Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2717: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 19 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2717e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 09/25/2019); Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | House | Suspend House Rule to allow Introduction and Consideration (Reps. Wallner, Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 334-25 by necessary two-thirds vote 09/25/2019 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Ought to Pass; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Introduction; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to suspend all rules necessary to permit the consideration of HB 4 at the present time and if adopted, to permit third reading and final passage in the early session, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 316-40 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 6 |
2019-09-25 | House | Introduced and Adopted (without objection) 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 4 |