NH HB398 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study and evaluate providing financial incentives for professional media production activity in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study and evaluate providing financial incentives for professional media production activity in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Werner Horn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Horn) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 10 |