NH HB397 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to drivers' licenses for New Hampshire residents who do not possess a social security card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to drivers' licenses for New Hampshire residents who do not possess a social security card.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Rereferred (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 204 N: 137 NV: 30 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Table (Y: 139 N: 201 NV: 31 Abs: 29) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0650h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-137 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 50
2019-03-20HouseLay on Table (Rep. Packard): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 139-201 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 51
2019-03-20HouseAmendment # 2019-0650h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 50
2019-03-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0650h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 36
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=412&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB397
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=414&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=414
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=139&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0397&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB397&ddlsponsors=&lsr=412
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=140&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0397&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB397&ddlsponsors=&lsr=412
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=147&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0397&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB397&ddlsponsors=&lsr=412

Bill Comments

feedback