NH HB396 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the land and buildings of Masonic temples or building associations from property taxation.
Title
Exempting the land and buildings of Masonic temples or building associations from property taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Shawn Jasper [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.920 | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.563 | |
2011-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 11, PG. 185 |